Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Mar 1963 | Born | ||
22 Aug 1992 | 29.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Awka, Nigeria |
7 Dec 2012 | 49.7 | Appointed | Bishop of Ahiara, Nigeria |
21 May 2013 | 50.2 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Ahiara, Nigeria |
19 Feb 2018 | 54.9 | Resigned | Bishop of Ahiara, Nigeria |
5 Mar 2020 | 57.0 | Appointed | Bishop of Ekwulobia, Nigeria |
29 Apr 2020 | 57.1 | Installed | Bishop of Ekwulobia, Nigeria |
27 Aug 2022 | 59.4 | Elevated to Cardinal | |
27 Aug 2022 | 59.4 | Appointed | Cardinal-Priest of Santi Martiri dell’Uganda a Poggio Ameno |
5 Feb 2023 | 59.9 | Installed | Cardinal-Priest of Santi Martiri dell’Uganda a Poggio Ameno |
Peter Ebere Okpaleke
Peter Ebere
Cardinal
Okpaleke
(born )
Bishop
of Ekwulobia
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Amesi, Archdiocese of Onitsha |
Ordained Bishop | Chapel, Seat of Wisdom, Seminary, Ulakwo, Archdiocese of Owerri |
External Link(s):
|
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025 |
✠