Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Maria Viganò


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1941 Born
24 Mar 196827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
14 Apr 198948.2AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
3 Apr 199251.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ulpiana
3 Apr 199251.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Nigeria
26 Apr 199251.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ulpiana
4 Apr 199857.2AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
16 Jul 200968.5AppointedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
3 Sep 201170.6ResignedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
19 Oct 201170.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to United States of America
12 Apr 201675.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to United States of America
4 Jul 202483.4CeasedTitular Archbishop of Ulpiana
4 Jul 202483.4Excommunicated

MicroData Summary
Carlo Maria Viganò
Carlo Maria Viganò
(born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,671
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025