Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Arlindo Cardinal Gomes Furtado

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Cardinal-Priest of San Timoteo


Motto: Jesus, O Bom Pastor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1949 Born
9 May 197626.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Cabo Verde
18 Jul 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cabo Verde
14 Nov 200353.9AppointedBishop of Mindelo, Cape Verde
22 Feb 200454.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mindelo, Cape Verde
22 Jul 200959.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
15 Aug 200959.7InstalledBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
14 Feb 201565.2Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201565.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Timoteo
10 May 201565.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Timoteo

MicroData Summary
Arlindo Gomes Furtado
Arlindo Cardinal Gomes Furtado
(born )
Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Catarina, Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde
Ordained DeaconSão José, Seminary, Praia, Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde
Ordained PriestChurch, Santa Catarina, Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Quebra-Canela, Praia, Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,538
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 4 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025