Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Leiria | |||
17 January 1918 | Erected | Diocese of Coimbra | Diocese of Leiria (erected) |
25 March 1957 | Territory Added | Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon} (Formigais) | Diocese of Leiria |
Diocese of Leiria-Fátima | |||
13 May 1984 | Name Changed | Diocese of Leiria | Diocese of Leiria-Fátima |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Leiria | ||||||||||||
1949 | 164,000 | 174,000 | 94.3% | 98 | 15 | 113 | 1,451 | 18 | 126 | 61 | ap1951 | |
1969 | 234,265 | 235,666 | 99.4% | 117 | 63 | 180 | 1,301 | 149 | 366 | 59 | ap1971 | |
1980 | 201,000 | 204,598 | 98.2% | 106 | 60 | 166 | 1,210 | 94 | 474 | 68 | ap1981 | |
Diocese of Leiria-Fátima | ||||||||||||
1990 | 238,000 | 240,075 | 99.1% | 103 | 80 | 183 | 1,300 | 106 | 570 | 69 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 273,700 | 280,000 | 97.8% | 108 | 67 | 175 | 1,564 | 87 | 550 | 73 | ap2000 | |
2000 | 255,000 | 265,000 | 96.2% | 103 | 64 | 167 | 1,526 | 85 | 510 | 74 | ap2001 | |
2001 | 255,000 | 265,000 | 96.2% | 102 | 60 | 162 | 1,574 | 76 | 500 | 74 | ap2002 | |
2002 | 255,000 | 265,000 | 96.2% | 103 | 65 | 168 | 1,517 | 83 | 480 | 74 | ap2003 | |
2003 | 255,000 | 265,000 | 96.2% | 100 | 55 | 155 | 1,645 | 73 | 488 | 74 | ap2004 | |
2004 | 255,000 | 265,000 | 96.2% | 101 | 54 | 155 | 1,645 | 68 | 482 | 74 | ap2005 | |
2013 | 272,162 | 296,362 | 91.8% | 92 | 70 | 162 | 1,680 | 86 | 686 | 75 | ap2014 | |
2016 | 266,328 | 292,402 | 91.1% | 90 | 64 | 154 | 1,729 | 77 | 655 | 75 | ap2017 | |
2019 | 270,334 | 302,120 | 89.5% | 91 | 68 | 159 | 1,700 | 1 | 83 | 629 | 74 | ap2020 |
2021 | 248,500 | 290,000 | 85.7% | 89 | 69 | 158 | 1,572 | 83 | 618 | 73 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024 |
✠