Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maclovio Vásquez Silos

Deceased

Bishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1918Born
18 Dec 194325.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 196950.3AppointedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
18 May 196950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
23 Jul 199071.6DiedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary
José Maclovio Vásquez Silos
Bishop José Maclovio Vásquez Silos
(born , died )
Bishop of Autlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Luis Potosí, Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Ordained BishopDiocesan Seminary, Chapel, Autlán, Diocese of Autlán, Jalisco

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025