Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Toppo

Bishop of Raigarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1957 Born
24 May 198830.9Ordained PriestPriest of Raigarh, India
23 Mar 200648.7AppointedBishop of Raigarh, India
24 May 200648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Raigarh, India

MicroData Summary
Paul Toppo
Bishop Paul Toppo
(born )
Bishop of Raigarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Raigarh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 1 May 2025