Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexandru Cardinal Todea

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio a Via Tiburtina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1912Born
11 Dec 193826.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
25 Mar 193926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
4 Jul 195038.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
19 Nov 195038.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
14 Mar 199077.7AppointedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
28 Jun 199179.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199179.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio a Via Tiburtina
20 Jul 199482.1RetiredArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
22 May 200289.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary
Alexandru Todea
Alexandru Cardinal Todea
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeleac, Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bucuresti, Archdiocese of Bucarest {Bucureşti}
Death PlaceTargu Mures

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.5 years
  • a cardinal for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Jun 1991
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025