Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramón Torrella Cascante

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1923Born
25 Jul 195330.2Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 196845.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 196845.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Minervium
14 Dec 196845.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Minervium
6 Nov 197047.5AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
6 Nov 197047.5AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Commission for Justice and Peace
22 Jul 197148.2AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
6 Mar 197450.8ResignedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
20 Dec 197552.6AppointedVice President of the Secretariat for Promoting Christian Unity
11 Apr 198359.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
20 Feb 199773.8RetiredArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
22 Apr 200480.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary
Ramón Torrella Cascante
Archbishop Ramón Torrella Cascante
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlesa de Montserrat
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Mar, Basilica, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025