Catholic-Hierarchy DC

James Francis Cardinal Stafford

Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Motto: In Principivm Erat Verbvm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1932 Born
15 Dec 195725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
11 Jan 197643.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
11 Jan 197643.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Respecta
29 Feb 197643.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Respecta
17 Nov 198250.3AppointedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
3 Jun 198653.8AppointedArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
30 Jul 198654.0InstalledArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
20 Aug 199664.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
21 Feb 199865.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199865.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Gesù Buon Pastore alla Montagnola
2 May 199865.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Gesù Buon Pastore alla Montagnola
4 Oct 200371.1AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
1 Mar 200875.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
25 May 200875.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
2 Jun 200976.8RetiredMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary
James Francis Stafford
James Francis Cardinal Stafford
(born )
Major Penitentiary Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
Ordained BishopMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Please contact the Cardinal through the Apostolic Penitentiary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2009
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Apr 1998
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025