Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Sigismondi

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Titular Archbishop of Neapolis in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1908Born
15 Aug 193022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
16 Dec 194941.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Pisidia
16 Dec 194941.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Belgian Congo
16 Dec 194941.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Rwanda
8 Jan 195041.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Pisidia
27 Sep 195446.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
25 May 196759.2DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary
Pietro Sigismondi
Archbishop Pietro Sigismondi
(born , died )
Secretary of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla d'Almé, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopCollège de Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 1
  • ab: Acta Apostolicæ Sedis, Volume 42, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025