Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antony Selvanayagam

Bishop Emeritus of Penang, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1935 Born
20 Dec 196934.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
6 Mar 198044.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
6 Mar 198044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
1 Sep 198044.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
2 Jul 198347.6AppointedBishop of Penang, Malaysia
7 Jul 201276.7RetiredBishop of Penang, Malaysia

MicroData Summary
Antony Selvanayagam
Bishop Antony Selvanayagam
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Penang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBentong, Diocese of Malacca, Singapore
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Kuala Lumpur, Archdiocese of Kuala Lumpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Penang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 557
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025