Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ángel Rovai

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Villa María, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1936Born
15 Aug 196326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
13 Aug 199962.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
13 Aug 199962.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
1 Nov 199963.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abaradira
3 Oct 200669.9AppointedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
3 Dec 200670.1InstalledBishop of Villa María, Argentina
28 Feb 201376.3RetiredBishop of Villa María, Argentina
19 Jun 202487.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Villa María, Argentina

MicroData Summary
José Ángel Rovai
Bishop José Ángel Rovai
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Villa María

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Asunción, Cathedral, Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Death PlaceInstituto Modelo de Cardiologia, Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,645
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2013
  • d: CB, 19 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025