Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Aug 1947 | Born | ||
27 Jun 1971 | 23.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Fiesole, Italy |
1 Mar 1990 | 42.5 | Incardinated | Priest of Roma {Rome}, Italy |
10 Dec 2007 | 60.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Civita Castellana, Italy |
12 Jan 2008 | 60.4 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Civita Castellana, Italy |
16 Feb 2008 | 60.5 | Installed | Bishop of Civita Castellana, Italy |
11 Nov 2022 | 75.2 | Retired | Bishop of Civita Castellana, Italy |
Romano Rossi
Bishop
Romano
Rossi
(born )
Bishop Emeritus
of Civita Castellana
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Montevarchi, Diocese of Fiesole |
Ordained Bishop | San Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome} |
External Link(s):
|
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025 |
✠