Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maximino Romero de Lema

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy

Titular Archbishop of Aemona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1911Born
23 Dec 194433.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 196452.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
15 Jun 196452.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Horta
19 Jul 196452.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horta
19 Oct 196856.9AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
21 Mar 197361.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
21 Mar 197361.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aemona
18 Dec 198675.0RetiredSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
29 Oct 199684.9DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy

MicroData Summary
Maximino Romero de Lema
Archbishop Maximino Romero de Lema
(born , died )
Secretary Emeritus of Clergy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria de Bayo, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Isidro Laborador, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain
Death PlaceOn Airline Flight, Between Rome and Barcelona

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 34
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1964, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025