Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Francis Reidy

Bishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA


Motto: Ut Cognoscant Te


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1958 Born
25 Jun 199436.0Ordained PriestPriest of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
12 Feb 202566.7AppointedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
29 Apr 202566.9Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary
Richard Francis Reidy
Bishop Richard Francis Reidy
(born )
Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWorcester, Diocese of Worcester, Massachusetts
Ordained PriestSt. Paul, Cathedral, Worcester, Diocese of Worcester, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Norwich, Diocese of Norwich, Connecticut

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Norwich.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2025
  • ob/c1/loc: CB, 12 Feb 2025
  • c2+: CB, 24 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025