Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulos Faraj Rahho

Deceased

Archbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1942Born
10 Jun 196522.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 200158.1AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
16 Feb 200158.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Mar 2008³65.3DiedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Paulos Faraj Rahho
Archbishop Paulos Faraj Rahho
(born , died )
Archbishop of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,909
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025