Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
13 Jan 1974 | Born | ||
2 Jul 2000 | 26.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Córdoba, Spain |
1 Apr 2023 | 49.2 | Appointed | Bishop of Alcalá de Henares, Spain |
10 Jun 2023 | 49.4 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Alcalá de Henares, Spain |
Antonio Prieto Lucena
Bishop
Antonio
Prieto Lucena
(born )
Bishop
of Alcalá de Henares
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | La Rambla, Diocese of Córdoba |
Ordained Priest | Cathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba |
Ordained Bishop | Santos Niños Justo y Pastor, Cathedral, Alcalá de Henares, Diocese of Alcalá de Henares |
External Link(s):
|
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025 |
✠