Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franc Perko

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1929Born
29 Jun 195323.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 198657.0AppointedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
6 Jan 198757.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
31 Mar 200171.3ResignedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
20 Feb 200878.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

MicroData Summary
Franc Perko
Archbishop Franc Perko
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrka
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025