Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure Patrick Paul, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hyderabad in Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1929Born
3 Jan 195424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Apr 196738.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hyderabad in Pakistan
11 Mar 197141.9AppointedBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
14 Jun 197142.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
1 Sep 199061.4ResignedBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
18 Jan 200777.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Hyderabad in Pakistan

MicroData Summary
Bonaventure Patrick Paul
Bishop Bonaventure Patrick Paul O.F.M.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Hyderabad in Pakistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Hyderabad, Diocese of Hyderabad in Pakistan

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,344
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025