Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Mel Murphy

Bishop-Elect of Armidale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1961 Born
11 Jul 199231.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wagga Wagga, Australia
26 Feb 202563.6AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
8 May 202563.8Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary
Peter Mel Murphy
Father Peter Mel Murphy
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Armidale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenalla (Victoria), Diocese of Sandhurst
Ordained PriestSt. Michael, Cathedral, Wagga Wagga, Diocese of Wagga Wagga

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Armidale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 1 May 2025