Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
31 Dec 1947 | Born | ||
3 Sep 1977 | 29.6 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Mainz, Germany |
11 Feb 1978 | 30.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Mainz, Germany |
1 Oct 2002 | 54.7 | Appointed | Bishop of Regensburg, Germany |
24 Nov 2002 | 54.8 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Regensburg, Germany |
2 Jul 2012 | 64.5 | Appointed | Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
2 Jul 2012 | 64.5 | Appointed | President of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei” |
2 Jul 2012 | 64.5 | Appointed | President of the International Theological Commission |
2 Jul 2012 | 64.5 | Appointed | President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission |
2 Jul 2012 | 64.5 | Appointed | Archbishop (Personal Title) |
28 Feb 2013 | 65.1 | Ceased | Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
28 Feb 2013 | 65.1 | Ceased | President of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei” |
28 Feb 2013 | 65.1 | Ceased | President of the International Theological Commission |
28 Feb 2013 | 65.1 | Ceased | President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission |
16 Mar 2013 | 65.2 | Confirmed | Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
16 Mar 2013 | 65.2 | Confirmed | President of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei” |
16 Mar 2013 | 65.2 | Confirmed | President of the International Theological Commission |
16 Mar 2013 | 65.2 | Confirmed | President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission |
22 Feb 2014 | 66.1 | Elevated to Cardinal | |
22 Feb 2014 | 66.1 | Appointed | Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agnese in Agone |
14 Sep 2014 | 66.7 | Installed | Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agnese in Agone |
1 Jul 2017 | 69.5 | Ceased | Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
1 Jul 2017 | 69.5 | Ceased | President of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei” |
1 Jul 2017 | 69.5 | Ceased | President of the International Theological Commission |
1 Jul 2017 | 69.5 | Ceased | President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission |
1 Jul 2024 | 76.5 | Appointed | Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone |
Gerhard Ludwig Müller
Gerhard Ludwig
Cardinal
Müller
(born )
Prefect Emeritus
of Doctrine of the Faith
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Mainz-Finthen, Diocese of Mainz, Germany |
Ordained Deacon | Augustinerkirche, Church, Mainz, Diocese of Mainz, Germany |
Ordained Priest | St. Martin, Church, Mainz-Finthen, Diocese of Mainz, Germany |
Ordained Bishop | Saint Pierre, Cathedral, Regensburg, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany |
External Link(s): |
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025 |
✠