Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Eusebio Mestril Vega

Bishop Emeritus of Ciego de Ávila, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1940 Born
4 Aug 196424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Camagüey, Cuba
16 Nov 199151.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Camagüey, Cuba
16 Nov 199151.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cediae
9 Feb 199251.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cediae
2 Feb 199655.9AppointedBishop of Ciego de Ávila, Cuba
8 Jul 201777.3RetiredBishop of Ciego de Ávila, Cuba

MicroData Summary
Mario Eusebio Mestril Vega
Bishop Mario Eusebio Mestril Vega
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Ciego de Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuevitas
Ordained BishopSan Eugenio de la Palma, Church, Ciego de Avila, Diocese of Ciego de Ávila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciego de Ávila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,657
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025