Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Llano Cifuentes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1933Born
20 Dec 195926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
4 Apr 199057.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
4 Apr 199057.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
29 Jun 199057.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
12 May 200471.2AppointedBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Jun 200471.3InstalledBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
20 Jan 201076.9RetiredBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Nov 201784.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary
Rafael Llano Cifuentes
Bishop Rafael Llano Cifuentes
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Nova Friburgo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, México
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Death PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,072
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025