Catholic-Hierarchy DC

László Cardinal Lékai

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1910Born
28 Oct 193424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Feb 197261.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Feb 197261.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
16 Mar 197262.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
12 Feb 197665.9AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
24 May 197666.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197666.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia
30 Jun 198676.2DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary
László Lékai
László Cardinal Lékai
(born , died )
Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZalalovo
Ordained BishopSzent István, Cathedral, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 993
  • ob/cd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025