Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Chibly Cardinal Langlois

Bishop of Les Cayes, Haïti

Cardinal-Priest of San Giacomo in Augusta


Motto: Servire Deo Et Populo In Caritate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1958 Born
22 Sep 199132.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jacmel, Haïti
8 Apr 200445.3AppointedBishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti
6 Jun 200445.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti
15 Aug 201152.7AppointedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
22 Feb 201455.2Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201455.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giacomo in Augusta
7 Jun 201455.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giacomo in Augusta

MicroData Summary
Chibly Langlois
Chibly Cardinal Langlois
(born )
Bishop of Les Cayes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Vallée, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
Ordained BishopSaint-Joseph, Cathedral, Fort-Liberté, Diocese of Fort-Liberté

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Les Cayes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,610
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Aug 2011
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025