Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Larraín Errazuriz

Deceased

Bishop of Talca, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1900Born
16 Apr 192726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
7 May 193837.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Talca, Chile
7 May 193837.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubunae in Numidia
7 Aug 193837.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubunae in Numidia
21 Jan 193938.0SucceededBishop of Talca, Chile
22 Jun 196665.5DiedBishop of Talca, Chile

MicroData Summary
Manuel Larraín Errazuriz
Bishop Manuel Larraín Errazuriz
(born , died )
Bishop of Talca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceAuto Accident, Near Rosario, Archdiocese of Rosario, Argentina

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025