Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Jacquot

Deceased

Archbishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1904Born
16 Jul 192924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
20 May 195954.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gap, France
20 May 195954.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
30 Sep 195954.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
13 Feb 196156.2SucceededBishop of Gap, France
1 Nov 196661.9AppointedArchbishop of Marseille, France
25 Sep 197065.8DiedArchbishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary
Georges Jacquot
Archbishop Georges Jacquot
(born , died )
Archbishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAudincourt, Archdiocese of Besançon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Besançon, Archdiocese of Besançon
Death PlaceMarseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025