Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ibrahim Hélou

Deceased

Bishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1925Born
22 Dec 195126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Jul 197550.2AppointedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
23 Aug 197550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Nov 198560.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
7 May 198661.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
7 May 198661.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
3 Feb 199670.8DiedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary
Ibrahim Hélou
Archbishop Ibrahim Hélou
(born , died )
Bishop of Saïdā (Sidone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWadi Jezzine
Ordained BishopBeterke

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,519
  • aadm: Acta Apostolicæ Sedis, Volume 78, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025