Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
10 Sep 1921 | Born | ||
15 Jun 1946 | 24.7 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada |
28 Aug 1964 | 42.9 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada |
28 Aug 1964 | 42.9 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Belesasa |
18 Oct 1964 | 43.1 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Belesasa |
13 Jun 1967 | 45.7 | Appointed | Coadjutor Bishop of Amos, Québec, Canada |
31 Oct 1968 | 47.1 | Succeeded | Bishop of Amos, Québec, Canada |
19 Apr 1978 | 56.6 | Resigned | Bishop of Amos, Québec, Canada |
5 Jul 1986 | 64.8 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Amos, Québec, Canada |
Gaston Hains
Bishop
Gaston
Hains
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Amos
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Drummondville, Diocese of Nicolet, Québec |
Ordained Priest | Saint-Hyacinthe Confesseur, Cathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec |
Ordained Bishop | Saint-Hyacinthe Confesseur, Cathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec |
Death Place | Dupuy, Diocese of Amos, Québec |
Buried Place (Original) | Saint Phillip, Cemetery, Drummondville, Diocese of Nicolet, Québec |
External Link(s): |
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025 |
✠