Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oswald Thomas Colman Gomis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1932Born
3 Feb 195825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
9 Apr 196835.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
9 Apr 196835.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulia
17 Jul 196835.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulia
2 Nov 199562.8AppointedBishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka
6 Jul 200269.5AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
16 Jun 200976.5RetiredArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
3 Feb 202390.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary
Oswald Thomas Colman Gomis
Archbishop Oswald Thomas Colman Gomis
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKelaniya
Ordained BishopSte. Lucie, Cathedral, Colombo, Archdiocese of Colombo in Ceylon
Death PlaceColombo, Archdiocese of Colombo

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 54.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 3 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025