Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Giglio

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio

Titular Archbishop of Tyndaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1927Born
12 Apr 195225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
4 Apr 198659.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyndaris
4 Apr 198659.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
8 Jun 198659.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyndaris
25 Mar 199568.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
5 Feb 200275.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
6 Mar 201689.1DiedApostolic Nuncio

MicroData Summary
Paolo Giglio
Archbishop Paolo Giglio
(born , died )
Apostolic Nuncio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Valletta, Archdiocese of Malta
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, La Valletta, Archdiocese of Malta
Death PlaceLa Valletta, Archdiocese of Malta

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Mar 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 1 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Number 8,440
  • opd/loc: CB, 3 Sep 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025