Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Valerian Cardinal Gracias

Deceased

Archbishop of Bombay, India

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1900Born
3 Oct 192625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
11 Apr 194645.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
11 Apr 194645.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
29 Jun 194645.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
4 Dec 195050.1AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
12 Jan 195352.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195352.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata
11 Sep 197877.8DiedArchbishop of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary
Valerian Gracias
Valerian Cardinal Gracias
(born , died )
Archbishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi, Archdiocese of Bombay
Ordained PriestKandy, Diocese of Kandy, Sri Lanka
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Church, Bombay, Archdiocese of Bombay
Death PlaceBombay, Archdiocese of Bombay
Buried Place (Original)Holy Name, Cathedral, Bombay, Archdiocese of Bombay

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
  • a cardinal for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab/bomb: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 48
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 410, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025