Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
24 Jun 1972 | Born | ||
12 Dec 1999 | 27.4 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Graz-Seckau, Austria |
25 Jun 2000 | 28.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Graz-Seckau, Austria |
31 Jan 2025 | 52.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria |
31 Jan 2025 | 52.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Guzabeta |
1 May 2025 | 52.8 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Guzabeta |
Johannes Freitag
Father
Johannes
Freitag
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Graz-Seckau
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Lind-Maßweg, Diocese of Graz-Seckau |
Ordained Deacon | Cathedral, Graz, Diocese of Graz-Seckau |
Ordained Priest | Cathedral, Graz, Diocese of Graz-Seckau |
Ordained Bishop | Cathedral, Graz, Diocese of Graz-Seckau |
External Link(s):
|
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025 Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 25 Apr 2025 |
✠