Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Louis Marie Joseph Fihey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1931Born
29 Jun 195523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
31 May 197745.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
31 May 197745.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Remesiana
10 Jul 197745.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Remesiana
12 Feb 198351.3AppointedBishop of France, Military
22 Apr 198957.5AppointedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
2 Oct 200675.0RetiredBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
12 Mar 201785.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches), France

MicroData Summary
Jacques Louis Marie Joseph Fihey
Bishop Jacques Louis Marie Joseph Fihey
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNarbonne
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Death PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Buried Place (Original)St-Jean’s Chapel, Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Coutances, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2006
  • d: CB, 13 Mar 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,829
  • 23.loc: AJ, 13 Jan 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025