Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Pascual Cardinal Dri, O.F.M. Cap.

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1927 Born
21 Feb 194517.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Feb 194921.8Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Mar 195224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Sep 202396.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 202396.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

MicroData Summary
Luis Pascual Dri
Luis Pascual Cardinal Dri O.F.M. Cap.
(born )
Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFederación, Argentina
Ordained PriestCathedral, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo, Uruguay

Please contact the Cardinal through the Order of Friars Minor Capuchin.

  • a priest for years
  • a cardinal for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • perp: AK, 30 Jul 2023
  • cdea: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023
  • c1: CB, 3 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025