Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Klaus Dick

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Guzabeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1928Born
24 Feb 195324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Mar 197547.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Mar 197547.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Guzabeta
19 May 197547.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Guzabeta
24 Feb 200374.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Feb 202495.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary
Klaus Dick
Bishop Klaus Dick
(born , died )
Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEhrenfeld, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Death PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,722
  • d: CB, 25 Feb 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025