Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleixo das Neves Dias, S.F.X.

Bishop Emeritus of Port Blair, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1944 Born
21 Dec 196925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Missionaries of Saint Francis Xavier
22 Jun 198439.8AppointedBishop of Port Blair, India
20 Jan 198540.4Ordained BishopBishop of Port Blair, India
6 Jan 201974.4RetiredBishop of Port Blair, India

MicroData Summary
Aleixo das Neves Dias
Bishop Aleixo das Neves Dias S.F.X.
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Port Blair

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalangute
Ordained BishopStella Maris, Church, Port Blair, Diocese of Port Blair

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Blair.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,904, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025