Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Déniz Hernández

Auxiliary Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

Titular Bishop of Aliezira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1969 Born
22 Sep 199627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
16 Feb 202252.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
16 Feb 202252.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aliezira
26 Mar 202252.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aliezira

MicroData Summary
Cristóbal Déniz Hernández
Bishop Cristóbal Déniz Hernández
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValsequillo, Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}
Ordained BishopSanta Ana, Cathedral Basilica, Las Palmas, Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2022
  • ob: CB, 16 Feb 2022
  • c2+: CB, 26 Mar 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 251, Number 20,888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 25 Apr 2025