Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian Kivumbi Ddungu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Masaka, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1923Born
20 Dec 195229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Masaka, Uganda
11 Nov 196138.3AppointedBishop of Masaka, Uganda
18 Mar 196238.6Ordained BishopBishop of Masaka, Uganda
10 Jan 199874.4RetiredBishop of Masaka, Uganda
30 Dec 200986.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Masaka, Uganda

MicroData Summary
Adrian Kivumbi Ddungu
Bishop Adrian Kivumbi Ddungu
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Masaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSsango, Vicariate Apostolic of Uganda
Ordained BishopPetit seminaire, Bukalasa, Diocese of Masaka
Death PlaceKampala, Archdiocese of Kampala

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 19
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025