Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elden Francis Curtiss

Archbishop Emeritus of Omaha, Nebraska, USA


Motto: That We May All Be One


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1932 Born
24 May 195825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Baker, Oregon, USA
4 Mar 197643.7AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
28 Apr 197643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
4 May 199360.8AppointedArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
25 Jun 199361.0InstalledArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
3 Jun 200976.9RetiredArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary
Elden Francis Curtiss
Archbishop Elden Francis Curtiss
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaker City, Diocese of Baker City, Oregon
Ordained PriestSt. Francis, Cathedral, Baker, Diocese of Baker, Oregon
Ordained BishopHelena, Diocese of Helena, Montana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Omaha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025