Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brendan Oliver Comiskey, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1935Born
25 Jun 196125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
3 Dec 197944.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
3 Dec 197944.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibilis
20 Jan 198044.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibilis
4 Apr 198448.6AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
6 Apr 200266.6ResignedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
28 Apr 202589.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary
Brendan Oliver Comiskey
Bishop Brendan Oliver Comiskey SS.CC.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTasson, Clontibret, Diocese of Clogher
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Church, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceLouth County, Hospital, Dundalk, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Sacred Heart, St Johns Drive, Church, Clondalkin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,686
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025