Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armando Círio, O.S.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1916Born
29 Jun 194024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saint Joseph
14 May 196044.0AppointedBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
28 Aug 196044.3Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
11 Sep 196044.3InstalledBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
5 May 197862.0AppointedBishop of Cascavel, Brazil
16 Oct 197963.4AppointedArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
27 Dec 199579.6RetiredArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
11 Aug 201498.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary
Armando Círio
Archbishop Armando Círio O.S.I.
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Cascavel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalamandrana, Diocese of Acqui, Italy
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora de Lourdes, Church, Apucarana, Diocese of Londrina

  • a priest for 74.1 years
  • a bishop for 53.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 89
  • d: CB, 12 Aug 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025