Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Alexandre Chappoulie

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1901Born
20 Dec 193029.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 193129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
30 May 195048.7AppointedBishop of Angers, France
11 Jul 195048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
13 Jan 195957.3DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary
Henri-Alexandre Chappoulie
Bishop Henri-Alexandre Chappoulie
(born , died )
Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSeminary Saint-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Mouline, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceAbidjan, Archdiocese of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Maurice, Cathedral, Angers, Diocese of Angers

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 49
  • ln: AJ, 8 Mar 2017
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025