Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Cavallotto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1940Born
29 Jun 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Asti, Italy
24 Aug 200565.5AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
24 Aug 200565.5AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
15 Oct 200565.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
22 Oct 200565.6InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
9 Oct 201575.6RetiredBishop of Cuneo, Italy
9 Oct 201575.6RetiredBishop of Fossano, Italy
27 Apr 202585.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary
Giuseppe Cavallotto
Bishop Giuseppe Cavallotto
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoche dì Vinchio, Diocese of Asti
Ordained BishopSanta Maria e San Giovenale, Cathedral, Fossano, Diocese of Fossano
Death PlaceSanta Croce, Hospital, Cuneo, Diocese of Cuneo-Fossano

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,000
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2015
  • loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018
  • i: AM, 28 May 2022
  • d: CB, 27 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 27 Apr 2025