Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophile Albert Cadoux, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kaolack, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1903Born
21 Jan 192925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Mar 195753.5AppointedPrefect of Kaolack, Senegal
6 Jul 196561.8AppointedBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
29 Aug 196561.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
1 Jul 197470.7ResignedBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
14 Nov 198279.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kaolack, Senegal

MicroData Summary
Théophile Albert Cadoux
Bishop Théophile Albert Cadoux M.S.C.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Kaolack

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Cassin, Archdiocese of Chambéry, France
Ordained BishopN-D du Sacré Coeur, Basilica, Issoudun, France
Death PlaceMarseille, Archdiocese of Marseille, France

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1965, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025