Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Binini

Bishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1934 Born
15 Jun 195722.4Ordained PriestPriest of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
3 Dec 198348.9AppointedBishop of Sovana-Pitigliano-Orbetello, Italy
6 Jan 198449.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana-Pitigliano-Orbetello, Italy
20 Jul 199156.5AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli, Italy
15 Sep 199156.7InstalledBishop of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli, Italy
19 May 201075.4RetiredBishop of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli, Italy

MicroData Summary
Eugenio Binini
Bishop Eugenio Binini
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTraversetolo, Diocese of Parma (-Fontevivo)
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,865
  • c1/opd/i: AM, 28 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025