Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arduino Bertoldo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1932Born
22 Mar 195825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Civita Castellana, Italy
10 Oct 199259.7AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
21 Nov 199259.8Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
20 Dec 199259.9InstalledBishop of Foligno, Italy
3 Jul 200875.5RetiredBishop of Foligno, Italy
3 Apr 201279.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary
Arduino Bertoldo
Bishop Arduino Bertoldo
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnovo di Isola Vicentina, Diocese of Vicenza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Civita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana
Death PlaceHospital, Vicenza, Diocese of Vicenza
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Foligno, Diocese of Foligno

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,985
  • d: CB, 4 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 15 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025