Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Felice Bernabei, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Valachia, Romania

Titular Bishop of Prisriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1637Born
1 Nov 168952.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Valachia, Romania
1 Nov 168952.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Prisriana
16 Apr 169053.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prisriana
26 Dec 170265.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Valachia, Romania

MicroData Summary
Giovanni Felice Bernabei
Bishop Giovanni Felice Bernabei O.F.M. Conv.
(born , died )
Vicar Apostolic of Valachia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSangenisio, Italy
Ordained BishopWien, Diocese of Wien, Austria

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 324
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 9
  • v521: CB, 3 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,779

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 20 Apr 2025