Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Banchong Aribarg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1927Born
22 Dec 195629.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 197648.9AppointedBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
12 Jul 197649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
5 Nov 199871.4ResignedBishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand
1 Sep 201285.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand

MicroData Summary
Joseph Banchong Aribarg
Bishop Joseph Banchong Aribarg
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Nakhon Sawan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChanthaburi
Ordained BishopNakhon Sawan, Diocese of Nakhon Sawan

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,430
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025