Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Kodwo Amissah

Deceased

Archbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1922Born
11 Dec 194927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Coast, Ghana
7 Mar 195734.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
7 Mar 195734.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
16 Jun 195734.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
19 Dec 195937.0AppointedArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
22 Sep 199168.8DiedArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana

MicroData Summary
John Kodwo Amissah
Archbishop John Kodwo Amissah
(born , died )
Archbishop of Cape Coast

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElmina, Vicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Cathedral, Cape Coast, Archdiocese of Cape Coast
Death Place(car accident)

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1957, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025